TN SB2816 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes reimbursement to an insured for services provided by a licensed marital and family therapist. - Amends TCA Section 56-7-2401.
Title
As introduced, authorizes reimbursement to an insured for services provided by a licensed marital and family therapist. - Amends TCA Section 56-7-2401.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2882 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-02 - Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2816&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2816.pdf |