TN SB2815 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows HOPE eligible student, under certain circumstances, to regain a HOPE scholarship lost by leaving an eligible two- or four-year postsecondary institution, where the student had a HOPE scholarship, and enrolling at a Tennessee technology center, if the student subsequently returns to an eligible two- or four-year institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, allows HOPE eligible student, under certain circumstances, to regain a HOPE scholarship lost by leaving an eligible two- or four-year postsecondary institution, where the student had a HOPE scholarship, and enrolling at a Tennessee technology center, if the student subsequently returns to an eligible two- or four-year institution. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. on 04/07/10 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3242 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee