TN SB2812 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of a Tennessee Sheriffs' Association new specialty earmarked license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of a Tennessee Sheriffs' Association new specialty earmarked license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - S. T&S COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749 | |
2012-03-29 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-03-27 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/29/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. T&S Comm. cal. for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. T&S Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3026 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 749