TN HB3026 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 749
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 749
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes issuance of a Tennessee Sheriffs' Association new specialty earmarked license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes issuance of a Tennessee Sheriffs' Association new specialty earmarked license plate. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Pub. Ch. 749 | |
2012-04-19 | Effective date(s) 04/16/12 | |
2012-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-04 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-04 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-02 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-03-29 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-03-29 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-29 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-03-08 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-03-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-05 | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 | |
2012-03-01 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/5/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2812 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 749