TN SB2805 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from December 31 to December 1 the date by which the Tennessee commission on children and youth must annually publish a comprehensive report on the status of children and youth in this state and distribute the report to the governor, to each member of the general assembly, and to each of the state's depository libraries. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 4 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0883) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2916 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee