TN SB2787 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the office of legislative ombudsman. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As introduced, creates the office of legislative ombudsman. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2758 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee