TN HB2758 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the office of legislative ombudsman. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As introduced, creates the office of legislative ombudsman. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2787 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee