TN SB2776 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits county medical examiners to access the controlled substance database, absolves civil and criminal liability for authorized users acting in good faith within the proscribed limits, and establishes a presumption of good faith action where a medical examiner accesses the information for the purpose of conducting an investigation into a death or making a report as required by the duties of the position. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7; Title 39 and Title 53, Chapter 10.
Title
As enacted, permits county medical examiners to access the controlled substance database, absolves civil and criminal liability for authorized users acting in good faith within the proscribed limits, and establishes a presumption of good faith action where a medical examiner accesses the information for the purpose of conducting an investigation into a death or making a report as required by the duties of the position. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7; Title 39 and Title 53, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 924 | |
2012-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/12 | |
2012-05-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-04-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-26 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-24 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0812) | |
2012-04-24 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-02-27 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-02-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-02-23 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/23/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-26 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2825 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924