TN SB2766 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a local government or local education agency to create a program to incentivize medical professionals, police officers, firefighters, and teachers to live and work within the boundaries of the local government by providing grants to such professionals in an amount that is equal to the amount of property tax due on such person's principal residence. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 51 and Title 49, relative to grants by local government entities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2829 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-19 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.