TN SB2750 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Crossville to levy a privilege tax upon the privilege of occupancy by a two-thirds vote of its governing body. - Amends TCA 67-4-1425.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Crossville to levy a privilege tax upon the privilege of occupancy by a two-thirds vote of its governing body. - Amends TCA 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1065 | |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2718 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1065