TN SB2739 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds a victim's birth date to the list of information regarding victims who apply for compensation under the Criminal Injuries Compensation Act, which is to be treated as confidential and not open for inspection by members of the public. - Amends TCA Title 10; Title 20 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10; Title 20 and Title 29, relative to public records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2915 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.