TN SB2739 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, revises conditions under which a vacancy is declared on the board of mayor and alderman for the Town of Mason; removes authority of non-resident property owners to vote in town elections; provides mayor, rather than board, with authority to organize departments and offices of town government; revises mayor's duties; establishes the procedure for adoption and preservation of ordinances. - Amends Chapter 21 of the Private Acts of 2009.
Title
Subject to local approval, revises conditions under which a vacancy is declared on the board of mayor and alderman for the Town of Mason; removes authority of non-resident property owners to vote in town elections; provides mayor, rather than board, with authority to organize departments and offices of town government; revises mayor's duties; establishes the procedure for adoption and preservation of ordinances. - Amends Chapter 21 of the Private Acts of 2009.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44 | |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2708 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 44