TN SB2738 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes an outdated requirement that the apprentice plan developed by the boards and commissions of the various medical professions, in consultation with the division of health related boards, be submitted to the speakers, the government operations committees of the senate and house of representatives, the commissioner of commerce and insurance, the commissioner of health, and the commissioner of labor and workforce development on or before December 31, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2913 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.