TN SB2736 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, grants a defendant who has been charged with a criminal offense based on the use of force or threatened use of force and who asserts that the force was justified by law the right to a justifiable use of force hearing prior to trial, at which the prosecution has the burden to prove by clear and convincing evidence that the use of force was unlawful; requires the court to dismiss the criminal charges and find the defendant immune from criminal prosecution if the prosecution fails to meet that burden. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, relative to use of force.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2812 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee