TN SB2733 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes the board of mayor and aldermen to appoint a town administrator. - Amends Chapter 207 of the Private Acts of 1996; as amended and rewritten.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes the board of mayor and aldermen to appoint a town administrator. - Amends Chapter 207 of the Private Acts of 1996; as amended and rewritten.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 52 | |
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 52 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2705 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pr. Ch. 52