TN SB2729 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the office of education accountability within the office of the comptroller, in consultation with the department of education, to survey other states to determine how states use measures of parental involvement and student accountability in evaluating teacher performance; requires reporting and presenting of information. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the office of education accountability within the office of the comptroller, in consultation with the department of education, to survey other states to determine how states use measures of parental involvement and student accountability in evaluating teacher performance; requires reporting and presenting of information. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 731 | |
2010-03-25 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0994) | |
2010-03-25 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 731