TN HB2810 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 731
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the office of education accountability within the office of the comptroller, in consultation with the department of education, to survey other states to determine how states use measures of parental involvement and student accountability in evaluating teacher performance; requires reporting and presenting of information. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires the office of education accountability within the office of the comptroller, in consultation with the department of education, to survey other states to determine how states use measures of parental involvement and student accountability in evaluating teacher performance; requires reporting and presenting of information. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 731 | |
2010-04-20 | Effective date(s) 04/09/10 | |
2010-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-29 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-03-29 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-25 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-03-24 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-03-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-22 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1029) | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/18/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 03/10/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on s/c cal K-12 of ED for 03/03/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to s/c K-12 of ED | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Education Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2729 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 731