TN SB2726 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 886
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 886
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that any local education agency may donate any apparently wholesome food fit for human consumption to a county jail or bona fide charitable or nonprofit organization for free distribution, and will not be subject to criminal penalty for violation of unfair trade practice laws or civil damages arising from the condition of the food, unless an injury is caused by the negligence, recklessness or intentional conduct of the agency. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 53, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, provides that any local education agency may donate any apparently wholesome food fit for human consumption to a county jail or bona fide charitable or nonprofit organization for free distribution, and will not be subject to criminal penalty for violation of unfair trade practice laws or civil damages arising from the condition of the food, unless an injury is caused by the negligence, recklessness or intentional conduct of the agency. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 53, Chapter 13, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 886 | |
2010-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/10/10 | |
2010-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-04-28 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-28 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-04-22 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 04/22/2010 | |
2010-04-19 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/22/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 04/19/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-15 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1247) | |
2010-04-15 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-03-31 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-03-29 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-29 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-29 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1032) | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/29/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-22 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2805 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 886