TN SB2721 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that offense of soliciting the sexual exploitation of a minor can be prosecuted in this state against person located outside the state if the person solicited a law enforcement officer posing as a minor located within this state. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, provides that offense of soliciting the sexual exploitation of a minor can be prosecuted in this state against person located outside the state if the person solicited a law enforcement officer posing as a minor located within this state. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2796 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-27 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2010