TN SB2715 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-27 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits students from Lauderdale County, Alabama, and Tishomingo County, Mississippi, to enroll at the Savannah-Hardin County Center of Jackson State Community College and students from Alcorn County, Mississippi, to enroll at the McNairy County Center/Selmer of UT Martin without payment of out-of-state tuition. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-102 and Section 49-9-1001.
Title
As introduced, permits students from Lauderdale County, Alabama, and Tishomingo County, Mississippi, to enroll at the Savannah-Hardin County Center of Jackson State Community College and students from Alcorn County, Mississippi, to enroll at the McNairy County Center/Selmer of UT Martin without payment of out-of-state tuition. - Amends TCA Section 49-8-102 and Section 49-9-1001.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-21 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2699 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-17 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2715&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2715.pdf |