TN SB2707 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases, from 2.5 percent to 5 percent, the maximum amount of the occupancy tax that McMinnville is authorized to levy. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Title
As enacted, increases, from 2.5 percent to 5 percent, the maximum amount of the occupancy tax that McMinnville is authorized to levy. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 796 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2018 | |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 3, PNV 3 |
2018-04-09 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2666 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 796