TN SB2705 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Failed in Senate Education Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Failed in Senate Education Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs to include a course of instruction for students in kindergarten through grade 12 with curricula designed to educate students in conflict resolution that is age and grade appropriate. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to conflict resolution.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee / no second |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2818 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee