TN SB2703 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 3,000 to 750, the number of students for which one public school nurse is considered sufficient to adequately provide services for purposes of the Tennessee public school nurse program. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 68, relative to school nurses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to next calendar |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2158 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.