TN SB2693 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines "cable services" and "video services" for purposes of the Competitive Cable and Video Services Act to include video programming accessed via a service that enables end users to access content, information, electronic mail, or other services offered over the internet, including streaming video content; includes revenue from providing internet services as gross revenue for a holder of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 59 and Title 65, Chapter 25.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 59 and Title 65, Chapter 25, relative to services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2135 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee