TN SB2686 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a director or manager of the county or area office of the department of human services who determines that a state employee is eligible for food stamp assistance to notify the employee's appointing authority; requires the person's appointing authority to raise the person's compensation, within 60 days, to a level such that the person is ineligible for food stamps. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires a director or manager of the county or area office of the department of human services who determines that a state employee is eligible for food stamp assistance to notify the employee's appointing authority; requires the person's appointing authority to raise the person's compensation, within 60 days, to a level such that the person is ineligible for food stamps. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2601 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-21 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee