TN SB2685 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 664
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends protections and immunities available under state law for housing authorities to entities that an authority or an entity affiliated with an authority may form, incorporate, or partner with, for purposes of managing or developing mixed-finance housing projects. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends protections and immunities available under state law for housing authorities to entities that an authority or an entity affiliated with an authority may form, incorporate, or partner with, for purposes of managing or developing mixed-finance housing projects. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 20, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 664 | |
2018-04-11 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0741) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2018-03-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0741) |
2018-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/15/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1766 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 664