TN SB2684 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1075
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain requirements to be followed if a state governmental entity or an LEA receives a complaint from a person who alleges that antisemitism has occurred on the premises of a public school serving any of the grades K-12, or through electronic outreach from a public school serving any of the grades K-12. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to anti-Semitism in education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1075 | |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2673 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022