TN SB2683 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. - for review
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-25 - P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. - for review
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes provision regarding the appointing authority of the defunct Tennessee board for economic growth. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, deletes provision regarding the appointing authority of the defunct Tennessee board for economic growth. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-25 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. - for review | |
2012-01-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2603 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-08 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2683&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2683.pdf |