TN SB2666 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, changes the appointment qualifications for city judge; requires the city judge to be appointed by the mayor and confirmed by majority vote of the board of mayor and aldermen; removes state residency requirement for appointed city judge. - Amends Chapter 91 of the Private Acts of 2008.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, changes the appointment qualifications for city judge; requires the city judge to be appointed by the mayor and confirmed by majority vote of the board of mayor and aldermen; removes state residency requirement for appointed city judge. - Amends Chapter 91 of the Private Acts of 2008.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44 | |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2641 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pr. Ch. 44