TN SB2656 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the reporting month from January to March for when the attorney general and reporter must report information about orders for wiretapping and electronic surveillance to the administrative office of the United States courts, the speaker of the senate, and the speaker of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Section 40-6-308.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-6-308, relative to reporting month.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 618 | |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1822 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024