TN SB2647 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from January 15 to February 15 the date by which the bureau must submit an annual report to the chairs of the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives that describes the nature and purpose of any requests to utilize data from the all payer claims database submitted to the bureau or the health information committee. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2625 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-27 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration