TN SB2631 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decreases from 30 to 20 days from receipt of plan, the time within which the office of open records counsel must report back to a governing body as to whether the governing body's plan for electronic communication between members complies with the open meetings laws. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44.
Title
As introduced, decreases from 30 to 20 days from receipt of plan, the time within which the office of open records counsel must report back to a governing body as to whether the governing body's plan for electronic communication between members complies with the open meetings laws. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 44.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2623 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-25 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2631&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2631.pdf |