TN SB2630 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 759
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing approval required for teachers to take personal leave. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing approval required for teachers to take personal leave. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 759 | |
2010-04-20 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-04-06 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-04-05 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-03-31 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1031) | |
2010-03-31 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-03-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-25 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 23, Nays 9 | |
2010-03-25 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0993) | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 03/25/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 03/22/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3107 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 759