TN SB2628 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates Big Foot Adventure in Grundy County as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As introduced, designates Big Foot Adventure in Grundy County as a premier type tourist resort for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Comm. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2559 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee