TN SB2625 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires all fees, fines, and other penalties be paid to commission before license renewal for distillers, wholesalers, retailers, liquor-by-the-drink establishments, wineries, collectors, and direct shippers. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1; Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, requires all fees, fines, and other penalties be paid to commission before license renewal for distillers, wholesalers, retailers, liquor-by-the-drink establishments, wineries, collectors, and direct shippers. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1; Title 57, Chapter 4, Part 2 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Faulk [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-17 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 5/27/10 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/17/2010 | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2688 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: State & Local Government Committee