TN SB2622 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, categorizes the construction and operation of dairy creameries, milk bottling plants, and certain slaughterhouses as agriculture operations that are not subject to local zoning requirements when located on agricultural land. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 43; Title 44 and Title 53.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 43; Title 44 and Title 53, relative to the location of agricultural operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 4 PNV 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2740 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Failed in Local Government Committee