TN SB2619 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a commissioner of a state department from being employed by, or having any financial interest in, a public or private entity that is under the umbrella of, regulated or under oversight by, or in any way within the purview of the administrative or statutory authority of the department for which the commissioner has been appointed during the commissioner's term of appointment. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 8, relative to state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2847 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee