TN SB2613 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 30 days to 15 days prior to an election, the time period for persons to register to vote; directs county election commissions to conduct training programs for poll watchers prior to each federal primary election; directs the division of elections to create a program for the recruitment of poll watchers; directs county election commissions to maintain an online system to enable persons to verify the status of their voter registration application in real time. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2386 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-23 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee