TN SB2610 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits application of the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act to counties having a population of more than 75,000 instead of 68,000; change does not affect the current applicability of the Act. - Amends TCA Section 66-28-102.
Title
As enacted, limits application of the Uniform Residential Landlord and Tenant Act to counties having a population of more than 75,000 instead of 68,000; change does not affect the current applicability of the Act. - Amends TCA Section 66-28-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 847 | |
2012-04-04 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-13 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 3/20/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 3/13/2012 | |
2012-01-23 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2012-01-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2683 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 847