TN SB2607 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals antiquated private act prohibiting the register from recording deeds for real estate or plats unless it has been filed with the tax assessor first. - Amends Chapter 122 of the Private Acts of 1967; as amended.
Title
As introduced, repeals antiquated private act prohibiting the register from recording deeds for real estate or plats unless it has been filed with the tax assessor first. - Amends Chapter 122 of the Private Acts of 1967; as amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 59 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1113) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on S. Regular Calendar for 4/15/14 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | P2C held on desk. Local Bill |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2512 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-22 - Pr. Ch. 59
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2607&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2607.pdf |