TN SB2588 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that an agreement be reached, and a memorandum of understanding be jointly prepared, by the local board of education and its professional employees on each of the terms and conditions of employment that are the subject of collaborative conferencing. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires that an agreement be reached, and a memorandum of understanding be jointly prepared, by the local board of education and its professional employees on each of the terms and conditions of employment that are the subject of collaborative conferencing. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2144 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning