TN SB2582 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from seven days to 72 hours the period within which a physician must notify the board of medical examiners after learning that the physician has been criminally charged with violating the statutory requirements that a physician must satisfy prior to obtaining informed consent to an abortion from a pregnant woman. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29; Title 37; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20; Title 29; Title 37; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to abortion.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2779 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee