TN SB2578 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes planning commissions to promulgate provisions in its subdivision regulations, and recommend amendments to the zoning ordinance, for the establishment of review and approval powers for site plans and the establishment under zoning provisions for the review and approval of sustainable design and development of property. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4 and Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes planning commissions to promulgate provisions in its subdivision regulations, and recommend amendments to the zoning ordinance, for the establishment of review and approval powers for site plans and the establishment under zoning provisions for the review and approval of sustainable design and development of property. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4 and Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Pub. Ch. 634 | |
2010-03-29 | Effective date(s) 03/17/10 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-03-09 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-03-04 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 4 | |
2010-03-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-03-04 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-02-22 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-02-19 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 02/22/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-02-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2711 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634