TN HB2711 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes planning commissions to promulgate provisions in its subdivision regulations, and recommend amendments to the zoning ordinance, for the establishment of review and approval powers for site plans and the establishment under zoning provisions for the review and approval of sustainable design and development of property. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4 and Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, authorizes planning commissions to promulgate provisions in its subdivision regulations, and recommend amendments to the zoning ordinance, for the establishment of review and approval powers for site plans and the establishment under zoning provisions for the review and approval of sustainable design and development of property. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4 and Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 634 | |
2010-03-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-03-01 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/04/10 | |
2010-03-01 | Reset on Reg cal. for 3/4/10 | |
2010-02-22 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/01/10 | |
2010-02-22 | Reset on Reg. cal. for 3/01/10 | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/22/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 02/18/2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 02/16/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 02/10/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2578 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 634
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2711&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2711.pdf |