TN SB2574 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires nursing homes and assisted-care living facilities to permit at least one family member or resident representative who meets certain conditions to visit a resident of the facility during end-of-life situations if a disaster, emergency, or public health emergency for COVID-19 has been declared. - Amends TCA Title 14 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14 and Title 68, Chapter 11, relative to visitation in long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Frank Niceley [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1123 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0890) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0621) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2535 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1123