TN SB2571 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that "NAIC" means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners or a successor organization to such.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that "NAIC" means the National Association of Insurance Commissioners or a successor organization to such.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3915 (Crossfiled) 2010-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2571&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2571.pdf |