TN SB2568 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes a reporting date of January 15 of each year for the board of regents, each state university board, and the board of trustees of University of Tennessee to submit a report summarizing grievance activities for the previous year to the education committees. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes a reporting date of January 15 of each year for the board of regents, each state university board, and the board of trustees of University of Tennessee to submit a report summarizing grievance activities for the previous year to the education committees. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020
2020-05-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 6/3/2020
2020-03-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee
2020-03-16SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3/17/20
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2440 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback