TN SB2560 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Equality in Financial Services Act." - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45 and Title 47, Chapter 18, relative to financial services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2669 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee