TN SB2560 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the legislature from requiring any person to participate in any health care system or plan. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the legislature from requiring any person to participate in any health care system or plan. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] | Sen. Diane Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-06-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2010 | |
2010-06-05 | S. Reset on last cal. | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Motion to recall from S. CL&A Comm. adopted. Ayes 22, Nays 10 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2622 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-09 - Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 44, Nays 39
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2560&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2560.pdf |