TN HB2622 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 44, Nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 44, Nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the legislature from requiring any person to participate in any health care system or plan. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the legislature from requiring any person to participate in any health care system or plan. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Conf. comm. report failed, Ayes 44, Nays 39 | |
2010-06-09 | S. conf. comm. appointed. (Beavers, Black, Jackson) | |
2010-06-09 | Conf. comm. appointed. (Lynn, McCord, McCormick) | |
2010-06-09 | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence in S. am. no. 1 | |
2010-06-09 | S. refused to recede from am. | |
2010-06-09 | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 | |
2010-06-09 | H. tabled the motion to return to the Senate. Ayes 44, Nays 43 | |
2010-06-09 | S. Recalled from H. | |
2010-06-09 | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 6/09/10 | |
2010-06-09 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 22, Nays 9 | |
2010-06-09 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2010-06-09 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2010-06-09 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2010-06-08 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-06-08 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 53, Nays 32 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. 4 tabled Ayes 54, Nays 32, PNV 2 | |
2010-06-08 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1662) Ayes 48, Nays 42, PNV 1 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. no. 2 tabled Ayes 51, Nays 36, PNV 1 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. no. 1 to 2 tabled Ayes 46, Nays 44 | |
2010-06-08 | Am. no. 1 tabled Ayes 48, Nays 44 | |
2010-06-07 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-07 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/08/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Reset on Reg cal. for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #3 for 6/03/10 | |
2010-05-20 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/19/2010 | |
2010-05-13 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/18/2010 | |
2010-05-12 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/13/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/13/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/6/2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/04/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/27/2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 4/27/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/20/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 4/20/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 04/13/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 3/31/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to last calendar | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2560 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-09 - Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)